pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
CC54015
9429043351909
Registered

Registration details

1/11/2016
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13406
Armagh
Phillipstown
Christchurch
8141
15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the Constitution

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for charitable trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Quinton Charles Hall Director 10/10/2016
Verity Joan Webber Director 10/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/05/2019 NOC003

Charity Documents