pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hoaka Limited
TWH Venture Capital Trust
CC35768
9429035566762
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
TWH Venture Capital Limited 30/06/2008
Hoaka Limited 29/06/2016

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the constitution

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other charities

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2010 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2009 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Matthew Jonathan Slater Officer 24/06/2016
Michael Earl Sang Officer 24/06/2016
Allan Hickford Officer 22/04/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chris Ford Trustee 24/06/2016
Andrew Harrison Director 22/04/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/08/2018 NOC009
29/06/2016 NOC005
27/03/2015 NOC004
22/06/2011 NOC003
18/10/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents