pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MWD Helicopters Limited
CC54438
9429038395932
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2017
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 3075
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Capital (Australia) Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the clause 2.4 of the constitution.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Other charities

Entity Structure

Charitable trustee for charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanne Patricia Allison Officer 1/03/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Eric Pohio Officer 31/03/2021
Quinton Charles HALL Director 31/07/2020
Verity Joan WEBBER Director 5/06/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/04/2021 NOC008
8/03/2021 NOC007
3/05/2019 NOC003

Charity Documents