pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Trust
CC35591
9429035930778
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Capital (Australia) Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the constitution

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other (please state)

(Other Charity - Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust), Other charities

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanne Patricia Allison Officer 1/03/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Eric Pohio Officer 31/03/2021
Quinton Hall Officer 31/07/2020
Verity Webber Officer 5/06/2020
Ross Keenan Officer 25/08/2014
Dean Lawrie Director 24/04/2014
John Paul Bennett Thorburn Director 21/02/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/04/2021 NOC018
8/03/2021 NOC017
16/06/2020 NOC015
3/05/2019 NOC013
25/03/2015 NOC009
27/08/2014 NOC008
30/04/2014 NOC007
24/02/2014 NOC006
29/06/2011 NOC005
29/06/2011 NOC004

Charity Documents