pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Seeds For Humanity NZ Charitable Trust
Seeds For Humanity NZ
CC58208
N/A
Registered

Registration details

18/05/2020
March 31

Address for service

12 Tarras Road
Kumeu
0810

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/SeedsForHumanityNZ
www.instagram.com/seedsforhumanitynz/

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa, Tonga, Vanuatu


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to bring positive change in people’s lives through promoting human connection, education, physical and emotional well-being, and general social well-being.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Phillips Trustee 3/02/2021
Ionela Bajarca Founder/Trustee 29/04/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jennifer Ivey Trustee 22/01/2021
Camelia Iordache Trustee 11/12/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/02/2021 NOC005
3/02/2021 NOC004
25/01/2021 NOC003
14/12/2020 NOC002
28/10/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents