pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nawawi Center Limited
CC57909
N/A
Registered

Registration details

11/03/2020
March 31

Address for service

18 Harvard Avenue
Wigram
Christchurch
8042

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Developing and providing programmes to nurture confident, balanced youth with a strong rooted New Zealand Muslim Identity. The programmes intertwine spirituality, education, culture, mental health and society and are provided in safe, caring, and positive environments for youth.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

We are a registered company. We have a managing director who oversees the organisation. We have key positions such as financial officer, administrator, IT officer, marketing officer, project adviser and multiple team leaders. The team leaders are assigned to particular projects within our different programmes. These positions together comprise the core team. The core team is responsible for collective decision making, strategy and direction.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Abdifatah Aden Ibrahim Officer 21/12/2020
Asayal Almutairi Officer 21/12/2020
Salha Hasi Secretary 21/12/2020
Noorayesha Saleha Jones Officer 10/12/2020
Zayid Abdullah Jones Officer 10/12/2020
Hesham Jones Director 4/09/2019
Zimna Thaufeeg Treasurer 4/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hashmat Lafraie Strategy Advisor 27/11/2020
Nadiah Ali Strategy Advisor & Project Advisor 27/11/2020
Noorayesha Saleha Jones Director 27/11/2020
Zayid Jones Director 27/11/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/02/2021 NOC005
10/12/2020 NOC003
30/11/2020 NOC002
28/08/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents