pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Women In Sport Aotearoa Incorporated
WISPA, Ngā Wāhine Hākinakina o Aotearoa
CC57755
N/A
Registered

Registration details

3/03/2020
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 67088
Mount Eden
Auckland
1349
14 Normanby Road
Sport Central
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

0275465836
n/a
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WomeninSportAotearoa
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/WISPAotearoa
https://www.instagram.com/WISPAotearoa/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

WISPA's purpose is to transform sport for the betterment of women's and girls' lives by: being the voice for women in sport; leading the change in influence, representation and leadership; promoting the value of, and promoting equal opportunity for, women and girls in sport; commissioning, disseminating, reviewing and monitoring existing and proposed research on relevant matters for women in sport; and promoting attitudes and behaviour which enhance or assist in achieving these objects.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sport / recreation

Health

Other (please state)

(Women), Children / young people

Entity Structure

WISPA is a society incorporated under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908. Its governing body is its Board, comprising 5 to 8 individuals appointed by an Appointments Panel. Co-opted Board Members and Associate Board members are possible according to the Rules. Membership is open to individuals and entities. WISPA operates to advance and achieve its purpose, not for the benefit of its members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 18/12/2020 $438,164 $434,997

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Erin Roxburgh-Makea Board Member 29/10/2020
Kelly Evans Non-voting Associate Board Member 29/10/2020
Tim Corbett Board Member 29/10/2020
Martin Sneddon Board Member 14/06/2019
Nicki Nicol Board Member 12/04/2019
James Gibson Board Member 14/09/2018
Rachel Froggatt Chief Executive Officer 3/09/2018
Julie Paterson Board Member 23/01/2017
Louisa Wall Board Member 23/01/2017
Pauline Harrison Board Member 23/01/2017

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents