pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Kiwi Kids Music Trust
Kiwi Kids Music
CC57061
N/A
Registered

Registration details

19/07/2019
March 31

Address for service

62 Nook Road
RD 2
Lake Hawea
Wanaka
9382

Charity's other details

027 367 9940‬
Facebook icon image
KiwiKidsMusic
https://www.instagram.com/kiwikidsmusic/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage young New Zealanders and their families to engage with kiwi children's music and encourage them to compose music, as a way to celebrate their identity and be empowered to have their voice heard through involvement in performing arts. These opportunities will support the growth of the children's music industry in New Zealand and for children's music artists to have healthy, sustainable and rewarding careers.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Economic development

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust is an independent entity and is not part of a group of Trusts. The Trust is governed by its trustees. There is a minimum of 5 Trustee and a maximum of 10 Trustees at any given time. The Board of Trustees has all the power of absolute owners of the Trust Fund to do all lawful acts and things consistent with the charitable purpose of the Trust. The Board will meet at least three (3) times every year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $17,674 $2,604

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Smith Trustee 6/08/2020
Lucy Margaret Hiku Trustee 6/08/2020
Anna van Riel Trustee 16/05/2019
Abigail Rutledge Trustee 14/01/2019
Judith Cranston Trustee 14/01/2019
Rosalind Manowitz Trustee 14/01/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher Lam Sam Trustee 28/01/2021
Sarah Paterson Trustee 30/09/2020
Suzanne Cato Trustee 16/06/2020
Arthur Baysting Trustee 3/12/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/02/2021 NOC005
24/11/2020 NOC004
21/06/2020 NOC002
13/02/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents