pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


She Sharp
CC57025
9429047458970
Registered

Registration details

4/06/2019
June 30

Address for service

12 Basra Drive
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/shesharpnz
Twitter icon image
@shesharp_nz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We aim to encourage women in computer science, computer engineering, IT, and tech-related fields to develop academically and professionally. In addition, we help you to network and learn with each other; fostering the advancement of women in high school, university and industry. Secondly, it is our goal to influence the next generation by promoting computer science and related fields to high school students who haven’t yet decided which career path to follow.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Auckland. Our trust deed states that we must have between three and twenty trustees. We currently have three Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions; president, treasurer and secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 30 June 2019 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mike MCCauley Treasurer 7/08/2020
Mahsa Mohaghegh Chair 10/05/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Archana Patel TBD 1/08/2020
Yun Jae Lee TBD 1/10/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/08/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents