pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lister Presbyterian Health Trust
CC56452
N/A
Registered

Registration details

19/12/2018
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 33276
Takapuna
Auckland
0740
Mary Thomas Centre
3 Gibbons Rd
Takapuna
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

021-828-839


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust provides grants to charitable organisations whose aim is to improve the physical or mental health, or spiritual welfare of people living in the North Shore or Rodney areas of Auckland. The Trust also assists individuals with grants in cases where it will relieve poverty and improve their physical or mental health, or their spiritual welfare.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Health

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust was established by deed on 28 November 2018 to carry on the legacy of the North Shore Presbyterian Hospital Trust. The Trustees comprise persons with the skills and experience required to govern the Trust in accordance with the Trust Deed. The Chair and Deputy Chair are elected at the Annual General Meeting. The Trust employs/contracts an Administrator who also fulfils the duties of Secretary.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
North Shore Presbyterian Hospital Trust CC23035

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 27/04/2021 $376,470 $88,833
31/12/2019 19/12/2019 $0 $0

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ann Tod Trustee 2/12/2020
Gabriel Maree Pyc Secretary 27/03/2019
Lara Simone Syddall Trustee 29/03/2017
Robyn Louise Pickerill Trustee 15/07/2016
Richard Edwin Charmley Trustee 8/12/2011
Ronald George Mills Chairman 28/04/2005
Patrick Geoffrey Alley Trustee 28/03/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Patricia Ellyett Watson Trustee 23/06/2021
Francis Paul Fransham Trustee 23/09/2020
Kenneth Robert Linkhorn Treasurer 30/06/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2021 NOC007
27/04/2021 NOC006
24/03/2021 NOC004
24/01/2020 NOC003
20/05/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents