pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MyFundAction New Zealand
CC56388
9429046720238
Registered

Registration details

28/11/2018
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Handshake People 6/03/2019
MyFundAction New Zealand 7/02/2020

Address for service

PO Box 125014
St Heliers
Auckland
1740

Charity's other details

+64274416181
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/myfundaction.nz/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To develop all round youth that is able to contribute back to the community. Next, to bring youth from different backgrounds together in one place and plan for an action to improve community life.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Health, Social services, Religious activities, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Auckland. Our trust deed states that we must have a minimum of three and nor more than seven trustees. We currently have four trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: president, vice president, and secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 14/06/2020 $45,159 $79,067
30/09/2019 15/04/2019 $50,716 $3,788

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mohammad Habibullah Md Ali Treasurer 9/02/2020
Husni Sharif Mohd Secretary 7/02/2020
Isma Fildza Hazry Ismail President 31/07/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ashmaniza Abu Samah Advisor 5/03/2020
Azlan Zainal Abidin Secretary 5/03/2020
Mohammad Habibullah Md Ali President 7/02/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/03/2020 NOC006
5/03/2020 NOC005
9/02/2020 NOC004
11/07/2019 NOC003
11/07/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents