pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Imagen8 Limited
CC56321
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/02/2019
June 30

Address for service

139B Bassett Road
Remuera
Auckland
1050

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

IMAgEN8 is a registered charity whose purpose is to foster sustainable connections with New Zealand's natural environment in our diverse communities through education, photography and technology.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

This charity is based out of Auckland. We currently have 2 Directors on the board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 4/09/2020 $407 $3,175
31/12/2019 18/11/2019 $45,719 $413

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nagaja Sanatkumar Founder and Director 15/06/2018
Tushar Sharma Founder and Director 15/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/05/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents