pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whakatane Medical Practice Limited
Med Central
CC56051
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/11/2018
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 729
Whakatane
3158
52B King Street
Whakatane 3120
Whakatane
3120

Charity's other details

07 308 5409


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To strengthen the whanau/hapu/iwi base of the Bay of Plenty and surrounding districts by providing health services which are suitable to the whanau/hapu/iwi base of the Bay of Plenty and surrounding districts, including by: a. providing health and clinical services to individuals and groups; b. providing a comprehensive approach to whanau/hapu/iwi healthcare and wellbeing.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

General public

Entity Structure

We have a GP clinic based in Whakatane We currently have four directors that constitute our governing board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2019 22/11/2019 $772,123 $693,140

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Spencer Tyson Webster Director 29/04/2020
Fiona Wiremu Chairperson 1/03/2017
Wiremu Matthews Director 1/03/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michelle Jade Tapsell Director 29/04/2020
Karl Smith DIrector 31/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/10/2020 NOC004
30/04/2020 NOC003
28/03/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents