pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Vulnerable Support Charitable Trust
Take 10
CC55753
9429043384273
Registered

Registration details

5/07/2018
March 31

Address for service

1 Woodstock Terrace
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details

0212274638
Facebook icon image
take10newzealand
Instagram - Take10nz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose is to support the vulnerable. This is done through two projects - Take 10 - Take 10’s purpose is to support the reduction of alcohol-related harm alleviated demands on emergency services and local hosts by providing a centralised base for vulnerable youth, and help eliminate the risk of sexual abuse to vulnerable people. Do Some Good - Lunch School project - Supplies lunch to low decile schools.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

The Head office is based in Wellington. Our trust deed states that we must have between three and seven Trustees. The VSCT has currently four Trustees that constitute our executive positions. These include a chairman, secretary, and treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $135,630 $37,724

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wayne Paul Johnston Executive Board member 1/12/2017
Adam Daniel Lynch Secretary 1/09/2017
Paul Eddie Retimanu Treasurer 1/09/2017
Clint Solomon Schoultz Chairman 18/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/02/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents