pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


ONEONESIX Trust
CC55394
9429046482327
Registered

Registration details

15/01/2018
March 31

Address for service

116A Bank Street
Whangarei
0110

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/oneonesixwhangarei/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To operate ONEONESIX (116A Bank Street) as an inclusive, accessible and financially sustainable community facility, supporting the practice of theatre and arts processes to build strong communities, develop audiences and empower leadership. To support the training, mentorship and assistance of young people, communities and individuals of all ages through theatre and arts practice by providing a community space where skills, projects and participatory activity can be shared and developed.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

We manage a council owned building in Whangārei as a community performing arts centre. Our trust deed states that we must have between five and nine Trustees. We currently have six Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: chairperson, treasurer and secretary. We are supported by the WDC who maintain the building but does not control or in any way direct our operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2018 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 4/08/2019 $41,410 $37,867
30/09/2018 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ashley Holwell Trustee 1/12/2017
Laurel Rose Devenie Trustee 1/12/2017
Mataara Raniera Taipa Stokes Trustee 1/12/2017
Matthew Garnet Keene Trustee 1/12/2017
Stacey Erin Awhina Henderson Trustee 1/12/2017
Thomas Peter Gowing Trustee 1/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/08/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents