pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Growth Educational Trust
CC55381
9429046325570
Registered

Registration details

2/01/2018
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 331317
Takapuna
Auckland
0740
23 Sylvan Avenue
Northcote
Auckland
0627

Charity's other details

027 346 6801
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/GrowthEducationalTrust/
https://www.instagram.com/growtheducationaltrust/

Africa

Uganda


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide Educational assistance to the learners of Uganda especially the Kabale District, namely around the Lake Bunyonyoni Region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

International activities

Education / training / research, Community development

Children / young people

Other charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

This Trust is our main vehicle for fundraising and dispersing funds to further our educational aims in Uganda.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2018 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 14/12/2020 $20,533 $26,290
31/12/2019 13/12/2019 $104,845 $45,711
30/09/2018 - - - - Exempt

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Gordon Harris Trustee 3/09/2018
Katrina Joy Hammon Trustee 3/09/2018
Stephen Philip Rogers Trustee 3/09/2018
Hamish Robert Coltman Founder, Trustee 28/08/2017
James Francis Coltman Trustee 28/08/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/04/2020 NOC005
6/09/2018 NOC003
21/08/2018 NOC002

Charity Documents