pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wakatipu Community Foundation
CC55258
9429046482334
Registered

Registration details

15/03/2018
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Queenstown Community Foundation 15/03/2018
Wakatipu Community Foundation 27/03/2018

Address for service

21 Bedford Street
Arrowtown
9302

Charity's other details

0223945955
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Wakatipu-Community-Foundation-1703170449745655/
https://www.linkedin.com/in/jennifer-belmont-837488109/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

4.1 The purposes of the Foundation are as follows: (a) To provide support, both financial and otherwise, for Community Organisations and for any Charitable Purpose. (b) To promote and encourage generosity among the people of New Zealand towards Community Organisations and any Charitable Purpose. (c) To establish and administer separate named funds within the Trust Fund in order to fulfill the wishes of individual donors who wish to support Community Organisations and any Charitable Purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

It is to be a registered charitable trust that is set up to inspire generosity in its local area and provide ongoing support for the charities and community groups that operate there. It facilitates this by encouraging the establishment of “named endowment funds”. The capital remains invested forever, and it is the income that is distributed each year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/10/2019 29/10/2019 $77,511 $19,245
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $30,000 $60

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ron Mackersy Trustee 13/02/2019
Ann Lockhart Trustee 9/01/2019
Simon Green Trustee 20/02/2018
Andrew Davis Trustee 6/11/2017
Jennifer Belmont Trustee 6/11/2017
Jonathan Gurnsey Trustee 6/11/2017
Raymond Key Trustee 6/11/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Victoria Onion Trustee 10/04/2019
Stephen Ross Brent Trustee 4/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/04/2019 NOC008
18/04/2019 NOC007
21/05/2018 NOC005
21/05/2018 NOC004
27/03/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents