pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hobsonville Point Marine Sports Recreation Centre Charitable Trust
CC55223
9429046207371
Registered

Registration details

21/07/2017
March 31

Address for service

Private Bag 300987
Albany
Auckland
0752

Charity's other details

021733917


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To fund, construct, maintain and operate a Marine Sports Recreation Centre building on land at Catalina Bay, Hobsonville Point, and to conduct marine oriented sports and recreation programmes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

General public

Entity Structure

Our trust deed states that we must have between six and nine Trustees. We currently have eight Trustees that constitute our Board, including three executive positions: chairperson, treasurer and secretary (who need not be a Trustee). We have four core stakeholders: Hobsonville Yacht Club Inc, Westlake Boys High School Rowing Society Inc, Hobsonville Point Residents Society Inc, and Kainga Ora - Homes and Communities (a Crown Entity set-up under the Kainga Ora - Homes and Communities Act 2019)

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2018 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 10/09/2021 $0 $0
30/09/2020 8/03/2021 $0 $0
30/09/2019 8/03/2021 $0 $0
30/09/2018 - - - - Exempt

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Aaron Mark Andrew Trustee 1/04/2019
Errol Haarhoff Trustee 1/04/2019
Tina Munro Trustee 1/04/2019
Andrew Hazelhurst Trustee 20/06/2017
Gregory Jones Trustee 20/06/2017
Kerry Stotter Trustee 20/06/2017
Michael Stanley Trustee 20/06/2017
Stuart Wills Trustee 20/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Button Trustee 1/04/2019
Brian Zouch Trustee 1/04/2019
Peter Herbert Trustee 1/04/2019

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents