pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Step Changers Trust
Step Changers
CC54711
N/A
Registered

Registration details

3/08/2017
March 31

Address for service

81 Truman Lane
RD 5
Mount Maunganui
Tauranga
3175

Charity's other details

022 160 1993
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/stepchangers/
https://www.instagram.com/stepchangers_/

Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Kiribati, Micronesia, Nauru, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, India, Indonesia, Laos, Nepal, Philippines, Sri Lanka, Syria, Thailand, Vietnam, Yemen


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of Step Changers Trust is to promote and manage corporate social responsibility partnerships that work to alleviate poverty, further education, improve the environment, and reduce inequalities in New Zealand, the South Pacific, and other regions. This purpose is achieved via the Trust’s four main activities; consulting with businesses on corporate social responsibility strategies, creating effective funding partnerships between businesses and charities, content creation and progress reporting for charities, and thought leadership in the Corporate Social Responsibility space.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

International activities

Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by a Board of no less than two and no more than seven trustees at any one time. The role of Chairperson may be held for a duration of up to three years, after which this term may be renewed or extended at the discretion of the Board. The wider Step Changers organisation is comprised of volunteer teams that work to deliver the Trust's charitable purpose.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 20/09/2018 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Emma Weston Chair Person 6/10/2017
Rosie Jane Whitmore Collins Board Member 2/02/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lucy McLean Board Member 1/05/2018
Michelle Anne Whitmore Board Member 1/04/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/03/2018 NOC003
1/12/2017 NOC002
8/10/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents