pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tukau Community Fund
Tukau Legacy
CC54544
N/A
Registered

Registration details

7/06/2017
January 1

Address for service

91 Hupara Road
RD 2
Pakaraka
Kaikohe
0472

Charity's other details

+6421 885 211


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The core purpose of the Fund is to support and empower Northland communities in the region of Te Tai Tama Wahine (Southern Bay of Islands) through the administration of funds for charitable purposes. The charity will be administered to support the advancement of whanau and community well-being by supporting: (a) Community events, facilities, services and projects; and (b) The advancement of education by providing sponsorship, scholarships, awards and courses.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

The Tukau Community Fund Board of Trustees (“the Board”) will be the governing body of the Fund. The Board must have no less than four trustees overseeing the establishment of the Fund at any given time.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/07/2020 26/11/2020 $344,295 $231,002
31/07/2019 26/11/2020 $513,400 $455,534
31/07/2018 21/08/2019 $159,240 $103,539

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chelsea Terei Trustee 2/05/2017
Adrieanne Downs Trustee 18/01/2017
Season-Mary Downs Trustee 18/01/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tatijana Simon-Larsen Trustee 1/01/2019
Jayme Armstrong Trustee 31/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2020 NOC003
9/06/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents