pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nelson-Whakatu Muslim Association Incorporated
NWMA
CC54356
9429043310272
Registered

Registration details

4/04/2017
March 31

Address for service

22 Collingwood Street
The Wood
Nelson
7010
226 Trafalgar Street
Nelson 7010
The Wood
Nelson
7010

Charity's other details

03 546 9550
N/A
Facebook icon image
Nelson Islam


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our purpose is to support Muslims living in Nelson and district, to build a resilient and inclusive community and to serve and engage Muslims and the wider community by promoting and advocating social harmony in a multi-cultural environment. We want to enhance the understanding of Islam among both Muslims and non-Muslims in order to promote social harmony and to enhance Muslims' ability to integrate into the wider New Zealand community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

General public

Entity Structure

We have a small committee (Exco), consisting of a President, Vice President, Treasurer, Secretary, Assistant Secretary, plus five further committee members. They organise all activities relating to the purpose of the association.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 6/07/2021 $68,418 $25,835
30/09/2020 21/08/2020 $31,194 $16,846
30/09/2019 4/07/2019 $46,454 $20,884
30/09/2018 4/08/2018 $65,574 $2,603

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mohamed Rashad Zafarulla Treasurer 4/05/2018
Mohammad Aboubakr Elseddik Vice President 4/05/2018
Omer Hajelssedig Committee member 4/05/2018
Aiyaz Ali Shah President 28/08/2016
Colin William Davis Assistant Treasurer 28/08/2016
Faridah Mohamed Tup I/C Social Committee 28/08/2016
Sadia Tahir Assistant Secretary 28/08/2016
Sithy Fathima Mowjood Secretary 28/08/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/06/2021 NOC007
6/05/2021 NOC006
12/06/2019 NOC003

Charity Documents