pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tutoring for Charity Trust
CC54161
Registered

Registration details

16/02/2017
March 31

Address for service

923A Waiwhero Road
RD 1
Ngatimoti
Motueka
7196

Charity's other details

03 312 9695


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To generate funds to donate to charities of the Trust's choice, which are working to decrease inequalities in society, by providing workshops/lectures/seminars wherein tutors can donate by giving time free of charge and attendees donate by paying fees for the class.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research

Other charities

General public

Entity Structure

Trust board which organises workshops to raise funds for charity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $1,950 $1,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ali Marion Brown Chairperson 30/09/2016
Heath Alexander Brown Trustee 30/09/2016
Katie Gimson Trustee 30/09/2016
Robert Paul Brown Treasurer 30/09/2016
Tobias Joseph Brown Trustee 30/09/2016
William Rupert Brown Trustee 30/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/05/2018 NOC002

Charity Documents