pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Okareka Dance Company Trust Board
CC52642
9429043276837
Registered

Registration details

6/08/2015
March 31

Address for service

73 Millar Road
RD 5
Lake Okareka
Rotorua
3076

Charity's other details

021 498 634

Oceania

Australia

North America

United States


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide educational support and education in the creative arts including dance and performance for young people including LGBTIA youth, Maori and Pacific Island youth, and migrant and refugee youth.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Arts / Culture / Heritage - education, training and research

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 30/11/2020 $115,089 $131,965
30/09/2019 17/11/2019 $110,237 $67,538
30/09/2018 15/11/2019 $318,654 $403,716
30/09/2017 15/11/2017 $200,816 $155,699
30/09/2016 7/12/2020 $0 $0

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter James Forde Trustee / Financial Advisor / Accountant 17/07/2020
Taiaroa Royal Trustee 20/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Raymond Bruce Hopkins Trustee 9/10/2020
Taane Mete Trustee 31/05/2020
Raymond Hawthorne Trustee 8/08/2016
Rona Teresa Brown Trustee 21/07/2016
Lesley Anne Margaret Slade Trustee 20/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/11/2019 NOC008
3/04/2016 NOC002

Charity Documents