pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Volunteering New Plymouth Trust
CC52564
9429043273645
Registered

Registration details

1/09/2015
March 31

Address for service

Level 4 Devon Centre
44 Liardet Street
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

(06)7588-986
Facebook icon image
Volunteering New Plymouth


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To act as the platform for the recruitment and training of volunteers, the promotion of good practice in volunteer management and the recognition of the contribution of volunteers to the community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Promotion of volunteering

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 24/07/2020 $99,736 $121,960
30/09/2019 5/08/2019 $106,029 $118,189
30/09/2018 2/08/2019 $98,078 $72,958
30/09/2017 1/05/2017 $69,737 $69,494
30/09/2016 31/08/2016 $45,675 $32,830

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marie Joan Riordan Trustee / Manager 11/09/2018
LeAnne Blakelock Treasurer 14/11/2017
Colleen Margaret Tipler Trustee 10/07/2017
Eileen Kiffin Chairperson 8/06/2015
Elaine Gill Patron 8/06/2015
Margaret McCall Trustee 8/06/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Di Herbert Trustee 30/10/2017
Sarah Foy Trustee 30/10/2017
Tracey Phelan Trustee 30/10/2017
Beth Findlay- Heath Trustee 1/05/2017
Marie Riordan Trustee 1/02/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/10/2019 NOC016
30/11/2017 NOC012
28/09/2017 NOC011
11/07/2017 NOC010
1/07/2017 NOC009
15/04/2017 NOC007
1/02/2017 NOC006
1/02/2017 NOC005
21/01/2017 NOC004
27/05/2016 NOC002

Charity Documents