pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Whakaahuru Singers Incorporated
Whakaahuru
CC51743
9429043285969
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2015
December 31

Address for service

C/O 19 Apuka Street
Brooklyn
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

0211407218
Facebook icon image
The Whakaahuru Singers


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purposes of the Society are to: a) provide a service of singing to people who are receiving palliative care or otherwise approaching the end of life. This may include people of any age living in their own homes, hospice, hospital or residential care. The service will be delivered without charge to patients or their families. b) train volunteer singers in a style of singing and a repertoire suitable for this purpose. The training will include a system of self-care and mutual support to ensure a safe emotional approach to this work.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Older people

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Members of Whakaahuru elect a management committee which includes a Chair, Secretary, Treasurer and between 2 and 5 other members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 18/05/2021 $12,596 $10,434
30/06/2020 25/03/2020 $18,998 $16,840
30/06/2019 28/03/2019 $11,997 $13,109
30/06/2018 29/03/2018 $11,298 $9,489
30/06/2017 5/04/2017 $4,950 $5,736
30/06/2016 6/06/2016 $4,261 $3,851

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Diwen Cao Secretary 17/08/2021
Elisabeth Ghislaine Willmott Committee Member 17/08/2021
Sue Chamberlain Chair 1/09/2020
Ian Lynton Brewer Treasurer 24/03/2020
Mark Gregory Hadfield Committee Member 24/03/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christina Mary Lawley Committee Member 1/08/2021
Stephanie Margaret Weaver Secretary 27/04/2021
Carol Shortis Committee Member 29/08/2020
Silvana Caradoc Evans Chair 10/06/2020
Bridgett Anne Parkin Treasurer 24/03/2020
Lynsey Ferrari Committee Member 24/03/2020
Susan Alexa Beaton Secretary 24/03/2020
Frederic Ian Albert Secretary 31/03/2019
Jennifer Margaret Stewart Chair 21/09/2017
Marianne Mackie Committee Member 28/03/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/08/2021 NOC022
19/08/2021 NOC021
18/08/2021 NOC020
28/05/2021 NOC019
2/09/2020 NOC017
2/09/2020 NOC016
5/06/2020 NOC015
27/03/2020 NOC014
19/08/2019 NOC012
11/05/2019 NOC011

Charity Documents