pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pacific Islands Dance Fono
Pacific Dance New Zealand
CC51710
9429043217120
Registered

Registration details

5/05/2015
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 5072
Wellesley Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1141
147
Great North Road
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

09 376 00 60


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Pacific Islands Dance Fono fosters and encourages the development of the Pacific dance sector of New Zealand. We are involved in running dance workshops, conferences, community and professional events promoting Pacific dance in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Organises Pacific Dance events, offers Pacific Dance workshops, mentors Pacific artists, leads training and supports services for Pacific arts cluster ), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development

General public

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Pacific Islands Dance Fono Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees, made up of the following volunteer Trustee members: Tania Olive Kopytko, Trustee appointed 20/02/2016; Obededom Unasa, Trustee appointed 29/07/2013; Justin Haiu, Trustee appointed 30/04/2012; Stephen Stehlin, Trustee appointed 30/04/2012; Wilmason Jensen, Trustee appointed 30/04/2012; Ben Taufua, Trustee appointed 6/03/2012. The Board appoints a Director who is charged with managing the organisation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 30/10/2018 $155,488 $154,477
30/06/2017 25/08/2017 $163,806 $199,213
30/06/2016 25/01/2017 $72,368 $82,188

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eseta Le'au Trustee 31/10/2018
Ioane Aleke Fa'avae Trustee 31/10/2018
Simione Junior Lolohea Treasurer 31/10/2018
Kolokesa Mahina-Tuai Trustee 1/07/2018
Cathryn Laban Trustee 26/09/2016
Tania Olive Kopytko Trustee 7/12/2015
Stephen Stehlin Chairman 30/04/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Obededom Unasa Trustee 31/10/2018
Wilmason Jensen Trustee 31/10/2018
Ben Taufua Trustee 26/09/2016
Justin Haiu Trustee 26/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/10/2018 NOC007
30/11/2016 NOC002
30/11/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents