pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Global Network Support Charitable Trust
Global Network Support Charity, The Network Support Charity
CC51522
9429043277223
Registered

Registration details

10/04/2015
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The New Zealand Network Charitable Trust 10/04/2015
Global Network Support Charitable Trust 3/05/2017

Address for service

PO Box 7069
Tikipunga
Whangarei
0144
24 John Street
Whangarei 0110
Kamo
Whangarei
0110

Charity's other details

02102832854

Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Kiribati, Marshall Islands, Micronesia, Nauru, Niue, Palau, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Algeria, Angola, Benin, Botswana, Burkina, Burundi, Cameroon, Cape Verde, Central African Republic, Chad, Comoros, Congo, Congo, Democratic Republic of, Djibouti, Egypt, Equatorial Guinea, Eritrea, Ethiopia, Gabon, Gambia, Ghana, Guinea, Guinea-Bissau, Ivory Coast, Kenya, Lesotho, Liberia, Libya, Madagascar, Malawi, Mali, Mauritania, Mauritius, Morocco, Mozambique, Namibia, Niger, Nigeria, Rwanda, Sao Tome and Principe, Senegal, Seychelles, Sierra Leone, Somalia, South Africa, South Sudan, Sudan, Swaziland, Tanzania, Togo, Tunisia, Uganda, Zambia, Zimbabwe

South America

Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Ecuador, Guyana, Paraguay, Peru, Suriname, Uruguay, Venezuela

North America

Antigua and Barbuda, Bahamas, Barbados, Belize, Canada, Costa Rica, Cuba, Dominica, Dominican Republic, El Salvador, Grenada, Guatemala, Haiti, Honduras, Jamaica, Mexico, Nicaragua, Panama, Saint Kitts and Nevis, Saint Lucia, Saint Vincent and the Grenadines, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Bahrain, Bangladesh, Bhutan, Brunei, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, China, East Timor, India, Indonesia, Iran, Iraq, Israel, Japan, Jordan, Kazakhstan, Korea, North, Korea, South, Kuwait, Kyrgyzstan, Laos, Lebanon, Malaysia, Maldives, Mongolia, Nepal, Oman, Pakistan, Philippines, Qatar, Russian Federation, Saudi Arabia, Singapore, Sri Lanka, Syria, Tajikistan, Thailand, Turkey, Turkmenistan, United Arab Emirates, Uzbekistan, Vietnam, Yemen

Europe

Albania, Andorra, Armenia, Austria, Azerbaijan, Belarus, Belgium, Bosnia and Herzegovina, Bulgaria, Croatia, Cyprus, Czech Republic, Denmark, Estonia, Finland, France, Georgia, Germany, Greece, Hungary, Iceland, Ireland, Italy, Latvia, Liechtenstein, Lithuania, Luxembourg, Macedonia, Malta, Moldova, Monaco, Montenegro, Netherlands, Norway, Poland, Portugal, Romania, San Marino, Serbia, Slovakia, Slovenia, Spain, Sweden, Switzerland, Ukraine, United Kingdom, Vatican City


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charity was formed with the charitable purpose of helping reduce poverty and inequalities - and the health of the planet

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(uses a network frame to help people in poverty)

Other (please state)

(helping people in need/poverty)

Other (please state)

(people who suffer from poverty and inequalities)

Entity Structure

The Global Network Support Charitable Trust is a not-for-profit organisation governed by a board of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 28/09/2019 $48,642 $47,994
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $54,161 $44,267
30/09/2017 16/12/2017 $19,884 $30,883
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $5,187 $15,987

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rose Keffas Trustee 4/02/2019
Hans Lak Trustee 18/01/2019
Olumide Emmanuel Idowu Trustee 12/12/2018
Saskia Adrienne Jeanne Marie Verraes Trustee 31/10/2018
Robert J Cipriano Trustee 29/10/2018
Quentin Mark Sothern Trustee 3/09/2017
Nadine Halliday Trustee 28/06/2014
Angela Sothern Trustee 4/06/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hans Utrecht Holland Dutch Lak Trustee 18/01/2019
Dulcie Takangaroa Mataira Trustee 3/11/2018
Michael John Pratt Trustee 31/07/2017
Stephen Sothern Office Manager 31/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/02/2019 NOC022
18/01/2019 NOC021
18/01/2019 NOC020
17/01/2019 NOC019
17/01/2019 NOC018
13/12/2018 NOC017
12/12/2018 NOC016
3/11/2018 NOC015
31/10/2018 NOC014
18/10/2018 NOC013

Charity Documents