pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Connect the Dots
CC51470
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/03/2015
March 31

Address for service

7 Pacific Street
Waiuku
2123
70 Hill Road
Manurewa
Auckland
2102

Charity's other details

021 990 370
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/Connectthedotscharitabletrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mission: To use creativity as a tool to improve the health and wellbeing of older people in New Zealand. Vision: Older people are empowered, engaged in creativity and connected to their communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Facilitation Arts), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development

Older people

Children / young people, Other charities, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Connect the Dots is an incorporated, charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 16/07/2018 $60,861 $50,345
30/09/2017 4/08/2017 $28,456 $38,945
30/09/2016 10/05/2016 $61,857 $36,455
30/09/2015 8/09/2015 $6,881 $6,214

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lincoln Jefferson Chairperson 22/02/2018
Eimi Tamua Trustee 23/11/2016
Priscilla Ann Brown Trustee 1/09/2016
Sarah Margaret Ferens Trustee 1/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Erin Marie McVeigh Trustee 6/11/2018
Julia Craig Trustee 1/05/2018
Judith Darragh Trustee 27/11/2016
Andrea Gaskin Chairperson 6/09/2016
Selina Anderson Chairperson 6/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/12/2018 NOC013
23/05/2018 NOC010
13/03/2018 NOC009
14/02/2018 NOC008
2/12/2016 NOC006
23/11/2016 NOC005
23/11/2016 NOC004
17/08/2016 NOC003
6/05/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents