pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Better Communities Housing Trust
Better Communities
CC50810
9429043240548
Registered

Registration details

4/08/2014
March 31

Address for service

7 Church Road
Taradale
Napier
4112

Charity's other details

021 751 932


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Better Communities was initially formed as a not-for-dividend company in 2013 in response to an apparent need for a fresh approach to social housing and a changing Government policy on how this may be provided increasingly by not-for-profit entities. The aim was to work with government, business and community partners to create great places to live. We have changed our purpose as Government policy decisions have not supported the original goals of establishing community run social housing providers. To this end, Better Communities has re-focused its efforts on supporting local charitable projects that benefit the wider Hawke's Bay community, with a focus on mental health. Our goal is to work with partners who share this vision and progressively improve the lives of people within New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Social services, Economic development, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust with a Charitable company established to operationalise activity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 7/10/2018 $11,134 $10,958
30/09/2017 8/11/2017 $2,200 $2,922
30/09/2016 5/10/2016 $0 $0
30/09/2015 21/12/2015 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Shaun Ralph Lines Executive Officer 3/07/2014
Nathalie Ida Maria Van Dort Executive Officer 2/03/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Shaun David Robinson Chair 1/06/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/09/2017 NOC003
5/10/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents