pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


LUG 4/2 Incorporated
Imagination Station,LUG 4/2,The Christchurch Brick Show
CC50587
9429043316939
Registered

Registration details

3/06/2014
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Bug 4/2 Incorporated 3/06/2014
LUG 4/2 Incorporated 22/03/2021

Address for service

60 Cathedral Square
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support the community and further education through a) Using a passion for construction play systems to make a difference within the community and inspire young people to develop their passions in order to do the same. b) Producing creative construction play system events for the purposes of finding charitable causes and inspiring others in the fields of engineering, education, and visual art. c) Assist in education of the community through participation in LUG 4/2 events, related workshops and increasing the capabilities of the community. d) Providing incentives for construction accomplishments and education. “To assist the development of the community, especially children through alternative forms of education”

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Organises events

Education / training / research

Community development

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

BUG 4/2 operates through an annually elected committee. This committee consists of five officers who oversee the Societies resources, who meet once a month to discuss the clubs affairs. The BUG committee assigns the mandates for each of the subcommittees and a budget for each project to work with, the BUG committee acts as an advisor to each of the projects and provide information and assistance when requested, keeping track of each of the projects progression through monthly reports

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Imagination Station (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $355,422 $300,283
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $411,628 $374,498
30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $322,137 $335,792
30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $361,795 $336,266
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $311,448 $320,031
30/09/2016 5/09/2016 $296,059 $294,686
30/09/2015 10/11/2015 $230,303 $157,223

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan William Reid Treasurer 7/12/2020
Elizabeth Catherine Gallacher Deputy Chairperson 30/09/2020
Treena-Marie Jane Aldridge Brick Show Chairperson 30/09/2020
Peter Frederick Middelkoop LUG Ambassador / Community Chair 26/09/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Philip Aldridge Chairman 30/09/2021
Audrey Henderson Trustee 30/09/2020
Garry Charles Neale Treasurer 30/09/2020
Jill Pears Deputy Chair 30/09/2020
Neville Petrie Trustee 30/09/2020
Sandra Isaacs Secretary 14/02/2020
Angie Smith Community Officer 13/02/2020
Ivan John Mackintosh Secretary 18/09/2019
Janine Dawn Branje Vice-Chairperson 11/09/2019
Jason de Vries Community 11/09/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/10/2020 NOC013
2/03/2020 NOC011
9/12/2019 NOC010
4/03/2019 NOC008
13/01/2019 NOC007
26/02/2016 NOC003
11/11/2015 NOC002
13/02/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents