pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tapawera Men's Shed Inc
MENZSHED Tapawera
CC50585
9429043241439
Registered

Registration details

4/06/2014
June 30

Address for service

4977 Motueka Valley Highway
RD 2
Kohatu
Wakefield
7096

Charity's other details

027 8822448
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/menzshedtapawera/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

From our Constitution.... The purposes of the Society are to: a. Provide a place for men in the Tapawera and districts community to learn skills from each other; and b. To engage and support all groups of men in the Tapawera and districts community to promote identity, sociability, companionship; physical activity, education and c. To share, disseminate and preserve the skills, abilities and interests that are relevant to the Members and the community; and d. To provide other support and assistance consistent with the charitable purpose of the Society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Older people

General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A management committee is elected by the members at each annual general meeting and meets each month to review shed operations, projects, health and safety matters, finances and correspondence. Our shed is located in the Tapawera Domain and is open for members each Saturday and other times on request. We allow the shed to be used for community purposes, e.g. Search and Rescue, Tapawera Show.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 13/08/2019 $5,668 $7,261
31/12/2018 23/08/2018 $5,720 $3,943
31/12/2017 16/08/2017 $3,727 $3,334
31/12/2016 14/11/2016 $1,600 $3,160
31/12/2015 16/09/2015 $6,970 $4,488
31/12/2014 18/09/2014 $964 $159

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Wilmshurst Chairman 14/09/2014
Sydney Peter Phillips Secretary 19/09/2013
Roger Maurice Bowman Treasurer 12/11/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Graham A Sturgess President 14/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/08/2019 NOC009
3/08/2018 NOC007
19/07/2017 NOC005
12/03/2017 NOC004
18/09/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents