pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Thankyou Charitable Trust
CC50391
9429043203956
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2014
March 31

Address for service

UNIT 6
3 Stafford Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

0800 895 146
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/thankyoucharitabletrust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The main purpose of the Thankyou charitable trust is to manage and distribute funds donated by Thankyou payroll and other contributing organisations to charities and community organisations and groups that apply for funding according to our model.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research

Community development

Economic development, Fund-raising

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Children / young people, Other charities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Structure comprises of the trust board which has 8 members. Two Co-Chairs, a secretary and a treasurer. Board members manage grant rounds, allocation meetings, accountability dinners according to location.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 9/06/2019 $101,920 $113,836
30/09/2018 10/06/2018 $87,835 $78,724
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $60,428 $34,062
30/09/2016 30/11/2016 $30,031 $32,785
30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $14,885 $10,563

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Halee Moss Treasurer 20/04/2017
Amanda Burgess Trustee 10/11/2015
Christina Bellis Secretary 10/11/2015
Blair Boswell Trustee 30/10/2013
Carolyn Jean Timms Trustee 30/10/2013
Lani Beth Evans Trustee 30/10/2013
Stephen Alan Walker Chairperson 30/10/2013
Thomas Mulder Trustee 30/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lucy Clark Trustee 15/11/2017
Amanda Burgess Trustee 1/05/2017
Jonathon Clearwater Trustee 11/08/2016
Hugh Sinclair Davison Trustee 10/11/2015
Thomas Bond Trustee 10/11/2015
Helena Kate Stevens Trustee 19/02/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/04/2018 NOC008
27/02/2018 NOC007
30/05/2017 NOC005
30/05/2017 NOC004
7/12/2015 NOC002
26/11/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents