pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Czech and Slovak Club Tauranga Incorporated
CC50020
9429043317707
Registered

Registration details

21/11/2013
March 31

Address for service

98 Taipari Street
Maungatapu
Tauranga
3112

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/csclubtauranga


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our community group connects people of Czech and Slovak background in the Bay of Plenty. We established the club for the purpose of supporting our children’s bilingual education and social growth with our main project being the Czech School Tauranga.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Czech Education (language, culture, heritage)), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Czech and Slovak Club is managed by Organising Team which includes President, General Secretary, Financial Officer and other Team Members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 20/08/2020 $28,027 $26,504
30/09/2019 23/06/2019 $42,213 $45,943
30/09/2018 23/08/2018 $37,534 $26,667
30/09/2017 23/09/2017 $32,080 $29,790
30/09/2016 21/09/2016 $24,979 $23,413
30/09/2015 21/05/2015 $9,510 $10,775
30/09/2014 6/06/2014 $5,825 $956

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jana Bennett General Secretary 22/05/2021
Lucie Brooks President 22/05/2021
Martina Balasova Financial Officer 6/07/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Frank Tomas Grapl President 22/05/2021
Kamila Lyons Team Member 22/05/2021
Lenka Andel General Secretary 22/05/2021
Klára Luxford-Rulíšek Team Member 22/02/2021
Petr Faitl President 29/06/2020
Veronika Dekkerova Financial Officer 20/05/2020
Alice Hansen General Secretary 11/01/2020
Eva Frith Events Coordinator 6/05/2019
Katerina Flekova Team Member 6/05/2019
Lucie Brooks Financial Officer 26/02/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/05/2021 NOC018
26/05/2021 NOC017
6/07/2020 NOC015
6/07/2020 NOC014
9/05/2019 NOC012
31/12/2018 NOC011
18/05/2018 NOC009
24/05/2017 NOC007
9/04/2017 NOC006
28/07/2016 NOC004

Charity Documents