pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Natureland Wildlife Trust
CC49944
Registered

Registration details

13/11/2013
October 31

Address for service

Hounsell Circle
Tahunanui
Nelson
7011

Charity's other details

03-548-6166


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To hold, maintain and control the zoological park at Nelson currently known as Natureland Zoo as a wildlife conservation and recreational facility for the general public; To preserve, protect and foster animals (including endangered species) and plants by conservation and promotion if breeding according to best practice animal husbandry standards; To educate the general public and encourage learning and awareness in the public in respect of the general principles of preservation, protection and fostering of the animals and plants; To undertake, promote or fund study and research for the purpose of achieving the Trust's purposes; To pursue any other purposes which are charitable under New Zealand law.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Services - Recreational Activities, Facilities, and Conservation; Zoo Management

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Board of Trustees with CEO/Director and hierarchy of 9 employees ( 8 full-time equivalents ).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/05/2018 20/06/2018 $617,050 $537,936
30/04/2017 26/05/2017 $561,045 $481,476
30/04/2016 24/05/2016 $539,949 $434,450
30/04/2015 14/06/2015 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen John John Standley Officer 20/03/2018
Darren John Quirk Officer 2/10/2017
Warren McLean Board Member 1/05/2017
Alan Keith Hinton Board Member 12/09/2013
Megan Christina Selby Board Member 12/09/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Peter Rutledge Board Member 23/02/2018
Brian John Mills Board Member 2/10/2017
Michael John Thomas Board Member 30/04/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2018 NOC004
31/05/2017 NOC003
16/09/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents