pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Korean Scholarship Trust
CC49811
N/A
Registered

Registration details

9/10/2013
March 31

Address for service

11 Coldstream Court
Ilam
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

http://www.kst.org.nz/deed.pdf

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

http://www.kst.org.nz/deed.pdf

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 1/12/2020 $12,243 $12,240
30/09/2019 31/07/2019 $5,843 $5,214
30/09/2018 4/11/2018 $10,040 $9,246
30/09/2017 28/08/2017 $8,252 $4,926
30/09/2016 6/07/2016 $8,532 $8,547
30/09/2015 24/08/2015 $11,661 $12,000
30/09/2014 20/10/2014 $10,411 $9,755

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Seong Sik Yoon Trustee 29/10/2015
Shawn Yoonshik Kim Trustee 29/10/2015
John Yang Trustee 26/08/2013
Judy Yun Trustee 26/08/2013
Tong-Wook Shinn Trustee 26/08/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Yoon Trustee 11/02/2020
Ho Chang Lee Trustee 1/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/02/2020 NOC007
23/03/2016 NOC002
30/10/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents