pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Parkour Association Incorporated
NZ Parkour - Tauhōkai Aotearoa
CC49781
Registered

Registration details

4/10/2013
October 31

Address for service

225 Tramway Road
Enderley
Hamilton
3214

Charity's other details

0277478426
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/ParkourNZ/
Twitter icon image
https://www.twitter.com/nzparkour


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

NZ Parkour provide services to the practicing, public and private sectors to further the following aims: 1. Promote positive self-development, health, and education through parkour in New Zealand. 2. Provide opportunities and support for parkour instructors, practitioners, and the public to further the above aims.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Health, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

NZ Parkour has a governing board of at least 3 board members who govern the operations of the organisation. The board is elected by the members at the AGM. The board then decides on its own Chairman, Secretary and Treasurer, and these positions can be held by one or more than one person. The board hires (this position can be voluntary) a CEO to oversee the management of the organisation and he has volunteers and paid staff who work under him, primarily Regional Representatives and coaches.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/04/2018 29/11/2017 $38,342 $24,274
30/04/2017 10/03/2017 $24,174 $29,044
30/04/2016 23/05/2016 $29,712 $22,387
30/04/2015 21/05/2015 $8,276 $2,580
30/04/2014 24/03/2014 $45 $1,320

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Terri Willcocks Board Member 24/05/2017
Nigel Elvidge Chairman 5/02/2017
Maika Hemera Board Member 26/03/2016
Nicole Puddle Secretary/Treasurer 14/07/2013
Damien Lawrence Puddle CEO 27/01/2013
Tim Rogers Board Member 27/01/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dane Grant Board Member 4/02/2017
Martini Miller Regional Rep 4/02/2017
Aren Olsen Board Member 26/03/2016
Leanne Jenkins Board Member 26/03/2016
Pearlmill Johnny Chow Board Member 26/03/2016
Terence Turner Board Member 31/07/2015
Adriaan Schipper Regional Rep 6/07/2014
Hannah Rogers Secretary 6/07/2014
Joseph Lowcay Regional Rep 6/07/2014
Tana Nitayawan Christchurch Rep 6/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/08/2017 NOC010
29/08/2017 NOC009
15/03/2017 NOC008
11/03/2017 NOC007
23/03/2016 NOC004
23/08/2014 NOC003
4/02/2014 NOC002
10/10/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents