pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Classic Yacht Trust
WCYT
CC49281
N/A
Registered

Registration details

11/07/2012
June 30

Address for service

30 Rawhiti Road
Pukerua Bay
5026
Shed 1
Clyde Quay
Oriental Bay
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0273098936
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/wgtnclassic/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Dedicated to the restoration, preservation, and sailing of vessels of historic significance to the Wellington region. The Trust also publishes original research into the history of the sport and the people of Wellington.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Restoration, preservation & sailing classic yachts), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation

Other (please state)

(Anyone who wants to participate/free participation for gen public, education), Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

Governed by a board of Trustees. Activities and tasks are led by appointed individuals or groups by the Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 15/07/2020 $5,346 $5,732
31/12/2019 27/10/2019 $4,621 $5,319
31/12/2018 23/11/2018 $5,526 $5,725
31/12/2017 23/11/2018 $5,290 $4,523
31/12/2016 18/12/2016 $7,270 $7,016
31/12/2015 22/01/2016 $4,258 $3,204
31/12/2014 15/02/2015 $13,284 $13,647
31/12/2013 6/01/2014 $7,303 $3,403

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graham Cecil Scott Trustee 2/11/2016
Phillipa Durkin Trustee 1/08/2015
David Fisher Trustee 1/08/2014
Meric Davies Trustee 1/08/2013
Peter King Trustee 1/08/2012
Ben Amor Trustee 1/08/2010
Gavin Pascoe Trustee 1/08/2010
Lawrie Stewart Trustee 1/08/2010
Milan Mogin Trustee 1/01/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Benedict O'brien Trustee 1/09/2016
Steve Cronin Trustee 1/01/2015
Sean Burns Trustee 1/01/2014
Murray Hartley Trustee 1/01/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2017 NOC005
29/09/2016 NOC003
29/09/2016 NOC002
28/09/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents