pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Filipino Chaplaincy Pastoral Council Wellington Archdiocese
Filipino Chaplaincy Pastoral Council - WA
CC48928
N/A
Registered

Registration details

13/02/2013
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 51029
Tawa
Wellington
5249
169 Main Road
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details

042327417


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A group of committed lay people who come together with their chaplain to share responsibility for the growth and nourishment of the community of faith and to undertake the mission of the Church in the Filipino faith community. The FCPC seeks to enrich the quality of community life and to ensure that community members have all that are needed to grow in holiness and to discover and live out their personal and community call to mission.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The FCPC has servant lay leaders working in three district Councils; Chaplaincy Pastoral Council (CPC), Chaplaincy Finance Council (CFC), Chaplaincy Youth Council(CYC). The CPC concerns itself with the mission of furthering of spiritual values within the faith community headed by a Chairperson, assistedby a Vice-chairperson, a Secretary and three Ministry Chairpersons, while the CFC is concerned with placing the financial. The CYC is consultative body of the for youth concerns.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 3/06/2020 $21,605 $14,666
30/09/2019 15/08/2019 $20,117 $14,083
30/09/2018 26/07/2018 $23,121 $12,422
30/09/2017 24/09/2017 $22,211 $11,722
30/09/2016 4/07/2016 $29,334 $26,784
30/09/2015 3/06/2015 $25,777 $24,158
30/09/2014 24/05/2014 $43,085 $28,613
30/09/2013 23/06/2013 $43,123 $37,154

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bernardo Velasco Formation 18/06/2018
Dioscoro Domdom Liturgy 21/01/2018
Fr. Marlon Tebelin Chaplain 21/01/2018
Gabriel Balauag Youth Council Leader 21/01/2018
Maria Evita McGuire Finance Administrator 21/01/2018
Mariel Bocacao Youth Council Vice Chair 21/01/2018
Ramon Angelo O. Robrigado Liturgy Ministry Servant 21/01/2018
Rapunzel de Leon Vice Chairman 21/01/2018
Rommel Arwin Bello Chairman 21/01/2018
Ronni Joshua V. Perez Formation Ministry Servant 21/01/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joel Yu Sison Outreach 17/06/2019
Nicole Heart Roseles Araiza Secretary 17/06/2019
Allan Gierran Chairperson 21/01/2018
Henrietta De Leon Catalan Chairperson, Outreach & service ministry 21/01/2018
Joselito Macaranas Education & formation ministry chairperson 21/01/2018
Maria Teresa Jaurigue Vice chairperson 21/01/2018
Maria Soledad Pagalilauan Secretary 21/01/2018
Maria Elma Gondra Zapanta Liturgy ministry chairperson 21/01/2018
Rodrigo Bello Chaplaincy youth council chairperson 21/01/2018
Archiel Ampong Finance administrator 25/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2018 NOC007
24/09/2017 NOC005
1/07/2016 NOC003
2/07/2015 NOC002
23/06/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents