pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hopeworks Foundation
CC48051
9429043237692
Registered

Registration details

23/04/2012
March 31

Address for service

P O Box 25-143
St Heliers
Auckland
1071
1-261 Riddell Road
Glendowie
Auckland
1071

Charity's other details

095751996
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/HopeWorksFoundation/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The provision of education in the areas of brain injury and/or neurological disease and/or neurological disorders The provision of personal mentoring and support services, for those with a brain injury, neurological disease and/or disorder and their families and/or carers; The production and/or publication of multimedia resources for education or social support services as detailed above. The provision of programmes that serve the wider community including training of outside agencies into neurological conditions and brain injury

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust providing advice, information, services and advocacy for people with neurological conditions and brain injuries.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 1/10/2019 $44,444 $21,528
30/09/2018 9/09/2018 $47,729 $27,630
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $44,176 $25,026
30/09/2016 19/09/2016 $23,274 $31,047
30/09/2015 5/02/2016 $18,451 $10,080
30/09/2014 20/08/2014 $13,518 $3,070
30/09/2013 26/08/2013 $2,000 $3,207

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lesley Hankin Trustee 5/02/2017
Pauline Rio Treasurer/Maori & PI Community Liaison Officer 11/08/2014
Katherine Susannah Johns Trustee 7/03/2012
Paul Richard Osborne Trustee 7/03/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dean Fox Officer 27/11/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/02/2017 NOC005
2/09/2016 NOC003
11/08/2014 NOC002
12/11/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents