pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kittycat Fixers
CC47636
N/A
Registered

Registration details

8/05/2012
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 89217
Torbay
Auckland
0742

Charity's other details

021 059 5863
Facebook icon image
http://facebook.com/kittycatfixers


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides funding for de-sexing pet cats. Rescue and rehome abandoned cats and kittens when able to and provide vet care, shelter, food and love. Makes grants / loans to individuals for cat desexing.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides funding for de-sexing cats. Rescue and rehome abandoned cats and kittens when able to and provide vet care, shelter, food and love.

Care / protection of animals

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

Non Profit Charity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 22/09/2021 $1,343 $1,487
30/09/2020 25/09/2020 $2,125 $1,821
30/09/2019 16/09/2019 $4,119 $5,944
30/09/2018 17/09/2018 $22,426 $17,730
30/09/2017 21/09/2017 $30,548 $27,624
30/09/2016 23/06/2016 $42,324 $39,199
30/09/2015 25/04/2015 $28,267 $26,483
30/09/2014 9/06/2014 $28,766 $28,790
30/09/2013 13/07/2013 $15,176 $14,774

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amy Barrett Officer 19/05/2015
Angela Purcell General Manager 9/02/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Janette Cooper Founder 31/03/2016
John Haw Administration 30/04/2015
Shirley Frances Hughes Secretary 24/02/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/02/2016 NOC008
26/02/2016 NOC007
19/05/2015 NOC006
3/03/2015 NOC005
2/03/2015 NOC004
26/02/2015 NOC003
9/02/2015 NOC002
13/07/2013 AR001

Charity Documents