pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Institute of Advanced Motorists New Zealand Incorporated
CC47565
Registered

Registration details

21/08/2011
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 26421
Epsom
Auckland
1344
148 Lone Kauri Road
Karekare
0772

Charity's other details

0278983269
n/a


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

IAM NZ is a charitable organisation dedicated to promoting better driving and riding and enhancing road safety, by taking the standard of driving and riding of existing drivers and riders to a level significantly higher than that required to pass the normal driving test.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Driver Education), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Driver Education

General public

Entity Structure

(a) The control and management of the affairs of the Institute shall be in the hands of the Council which shall be elected at the Annual General Meeting and which shall be comprised of the President, the Vice-President, National Secretary, National Treasurer (or National Secretary/Treasurer), and two to six general members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2016 2/01/2017 $15,449 $13,392
31/12/2015 19/11/2015 $5,741 $6,228
30/09/2014 23/09/2014 $6,355 $6,186
30/09/2013 15/09/2013 $8,430 $7,267
30/09/2012 26/09/2012 $4,940 $4,143

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graeme Bergh Chief Examiner, Motorcycle Division 25/02/2018
Gordon Peel National Treasurer 2/01/2017
Timothy Monck-Mason Regional Chair, Top of the South 11/09/2016
Carey Griffiths President 6/09/2015
Joanne Mitchell Council Member 6/09/2015
Peter Hookham Vice President and Regional Chair, Wellington 6/09/2015
Robert Powell Council Member 6/09/2015
Tessa Robins National Secretary 31/08/2014
Mark Fleming Past President 21/07/2013
Morne De Lange Chief Examiner, Car Division 21/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Philip Mcdaid Chief Examiner M/Cycles 25/02/2018
Keith Alan Bishop National Secretary 11/09/2016
Ken McGrath Council Menber 11/09/2016
Ross Gratton National Executive Committee 11/09/2016
Catherine Merrick Council Member Coopted 30/06/2016
Woodward William National Executive Committee 6/09/2015
Roger Fleming Council Member 29/01/2015
Bruce Everett National Executive Committee 4/11/2014
Richard Turnbull Treasurer 31/08/2014
Alistair Mcgregor Secretary 21/07/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/03/2018 NOC010
21/11/2017 NOC009
22/09/2015 NOC007
13/02/2015 NOC006
13/02/2015 NOC005
23/09/2014 NOC004
15/09/2013 NOC001
15/09/2013 AR002
26/09/2012 AR001

Charity Documents