pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Ballet Foundation of New Zealand Trust
CC47241
9429042876236
Registered

Registration details

11/01/2012
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 27050
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Level 1
5 Willeston Street
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 381 9031
04 381 9003


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2020 8/03/2020 $166,962 $66,829
30/06/2019 1/07/2019 $213,229 $70,896
30/06/2018 16/04/2018 $182,375 $82,480
30/06/2017 7/08/2017 $118,429 $41,349
30/06/2016 3/05/2016 $51,209 $19,122
30/06/2015 23/06/2015 $39,982 $19,593
30/06/2014 27/06/2014 $13,367 $2,413
30/06/2013 28/06/2013 $100,937 $2,428

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Isaac Hikaka Trustee 11/05/2020
Lilias Catriona Maighearad Bell Trustee 18/02/2019
Melanie Clare Morris Trustee 6/12/2018
Sarah Elizabeth Cole Trustee 1/04/2018
Ann-Louise Margaret Gower Trustee 15/06/2016
Ian Webster Trustee 30/11/2015
Victoria Muir Trustee 31/08/2015
Louise Binns Trustee 4/07/2014
Susan Satyanand Patron 13/05/2013
Jane Katharine Meares Trustee 31/05/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ros Burdon Trustee 23/11/2018
Rosie Dunphy Trustee 31/03/2018
Geoffrey Read Thomas Trustee 31/12/2016
Mark Sandelin Individual 3/08/2015
Margaret Anne Blackburn Trustee 14/05/2015
John Meehan Trustee 31/05/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/05/2020 NOC027
7/06/2019 NOC023
24/04/2018 NOC022
24/04/2018 NOC021
18/04/2018 NOC020
16/04/2018 NOC018
13/04/2017 NOC016
15/02/2017 NOC014
10/02/2017 NOC013
18/08/2016 NOC012

Charity Documents