pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Acromegaly Society
Trading as Acromegaly NZ
CC46693
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2011
March 31

Address for service

Suite 7
94 Grey Street
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

027 323 8114
Facebook icon image
NZ Acromegaly Society


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support and education to our members

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Patient Counselling

Other (please state)

(People with our rare condition)

Entity Structure

A shared Chair and committee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 26/07/2021 $1,743 $318
30/09/2020 22/06/2020 $1,782 $3,566
30/09/2019 13/08/2019 $1,852 $3,653
30/09/2018 15/08/2018 $3,118 $4,033
30/09/2017 29/08/2017 $5,543 $4,950
30/09/2016 7/12/2016 $18,626 $6,113
30/09/2015 26/09/2015 $3,229 $2,838
30/09/2014 9/09/2014 $1,435 $2,318
30/09/2013 4/11/2013 $2,642 $2,593
31/08/2012 22/08/2013 $6,218 $110

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fay Partington Secretary 21/02/2021
Alison Frances Chester Communications Officer 10/06/2018
Wayne Holtham Treasurer 16/05/2015
Clark McPhillips Co-chair 24/05/2014
Catherine Chan Co-chair 28/02/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jackie Jeffrey Secretary 17/01/2021
David Liebezeit Members Support 5/05/2018
Matthew Cuthill South Island Rep 23/04/2017
Ross Allan South Island Rep 16/05/2015
Donna Judith Bosson Public Relations 24/05/2014
Bronwen Evelyn Biggar Committee Member 22/07/2012
Thomas Foster Biggar Treasurer 22/07/2012
Nicholas William Rogers Committee Member 23/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/07/2021 NOC014
24/04/2021 NOC012
24/04/2021 NOC011
19/01/2021 NOC010
17/05/2015 NOC004
19/07/2014 NOC003
12/09/2013 AR002
7/07/2012 AR001

Charity Documents