pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Browns Bay Market Charitable Trust
CC45890
9429043219148
Registered

Registration details

12/12/2010
June 30

Address for service

14 Robin Lane
Browns Bay
Auckland
0630

Charity's other details

027 4535646
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/BrownsBayMarket/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Raise funds for Coastguard North Shore and also local community projects as agreed to by the local council ward.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

The trust can have between three and five trustees at anyone time, on a two year term with a maximum of three terms. A minimum of three trustees must be current financial members of Coastguard North Shore in order to maintain the intent of the trust to raise funds primarily for Coastguard North Shore.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 28/11/2019 $75,690 $41,670
31/12/2018 11/11/2018 $68,310 $17,560
31/12/2017 18/10/2017 $81,119 $165,629
31/12/2016 10/10/2016 $89,804 $99,924
31/12/2015 4/09/2015 $92,169 $87,579
31/12/2014 26/08/2014 $121,535 $24,144
31/12/2013 20/09/2013 $105,363 $81,845
31/12/2012 27/07/2012 $111,228 $43,316
31/12/2011 22/08/2011 $79,429 $43,359

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nick Carter Trustee 20/10/2016
Duncan Orr Trustee 2/12/2015
Roger Edward Donovan Trustee 22/10/2015
Chris Thomas Trustee 12/04/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chris Webb Trustee 31/10/2016
Duncan Lloyd Standley Trustee 22/10/2015
Jane Adams Trustee 1/09/2013
Rob Wightman Trustee 30/04/2012
Chris Turner Trustee 1/08/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/10/2016 NOC018
13/10/2016 NOC017
13/10/2016 NOC016
13/10/2016 NOC015
13/10/2016 NOC014
14/12/2015 NOC011
22/10/2015 NOC010
9/03/2015 NOC009
5/09/2013 NOC007
27/07/2012 AR003

Charity Documents