Use this to find information about a particular charity.
Charity Summary
Charity Details
Deregistration details
Financial information at the time of Deregistration:
The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:
- Retained as they are continuing to operate
Below are details of Wellington Girls' College Parents' Association Incorporated at the date of deregistration:
Registration details
Registration history
Registration Action | Date effective | Deregistration Reason |
---|---|---|
De-registered | 30/09/2020 | The charity is continuing to operate but does not want to be registered any longer |
Registered | 15/11/2010 |
Name change history
Name | Effective Date |
---|---|
Welllington Girls College Parent Support Group Incorporated | 16/11/2010 |
Wellington Girls' College Parents' Association Incorporated | 8/11/2011 |
Address for service
Charity's other details
Organisation with a focus on the following communities:
Purpose & Structure
Charitable Purpose
Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.
Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)
Entity Structure
Annual Returns
Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.
Exemptions
The first annual return due on the 30/06/2011 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filing their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 30/06/2012.
Officer Details
Officers
Past Officers
Charity Updates
Charity Documents
Date Uploaded | Document Type | Reference Name |
---|
No supporting documents.