pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Little People of NZ Incorporated
CC44798
9429042780342
Registered

Registration details

1/08/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 58145
Whitby
Porirua
5245

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Little People of New Zealand is a non-profit, charitable organisation that supports and informs people with dwarfism as well as their families, along with people who have a genuine interest.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Our Constitution states that the general committee consist of the President, Secretary and Treasurer and up to four other members of the Society. We currently have six committee members that constitute our governance board, including three executive officer positions: President, Treasurer and Secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/11/2019 10/11/2019 $3,146 $1,312
30/11/2018 4/11/2018 $2,539 $1,469
30/09/2017 29/10/2017 $4,447 $4,628
30/09/2016 30/12/2016 $9,343 $3,883
30/09/2015 31/10/2015 $2,668 $2,081
30/09/2014 5/11/2014 $48,895 $52,687
30/09/2013 3/12/2013 $2,241 $3,701
30/09/2012 14/07/2013 $2,466 $5,513
30/09/2011 2/10/2012 $23,749 $11,252

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ellie Bloomfield Secretary 20/10/2019
Roscoe Lethaby Treasurer 20/10/2019
Zena Sargison Vice-President 20/10/2019
Evelyn Sutherland Membership Liaison 21/10/2018
Jess Smith Media Liaison 31/01/2018
Katrina Bootsma President 1/11/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ebony Kepa Vice-President 20/10/2019
Nathan Kidd Treasurer 20/10/2019
Verity Kidd Secretary 20/10/2019
Hollie Howland President 21/10/2018
Sharon Chappell Secretary 21/10/2018
Laura Jenkins Treasurer 31/10/2017
Loren Corbett Media Liaison 22/10/2017
Katrina Bootsma Membership liason 1/11/2015
Leah Wayland Secretary 1/11/2015
Carol Carr Secretary/Treasurer 30/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/01/2018 NOC011
30/10/2017 NOC010
21/01/2017 NOC008
2/12/2015 NOC006
25/05/2015 NOC005
14/05/2015 NOC004
14/07/2013 AR004
17/01/2012 AR003

Charity Documents