pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Buddhist Council Incorporated
CC44028
9429043096817
Registered

Registration details

18/04/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 109729
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
52 Princes St
Onehunga
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Fostering information-sharing, respect, collaboration and friendship between Buddhist communities in Aotearoa. The Society is established for charitable purposes within New Zealand. In particular the Society will: a. Create respectful relationships among Buddhist communities and between Buddhist and other communities in order to develop a harmonious and peaceful New Zealand. b. Share information and build networks. c. Work together on common concerns and problems. d. Strengthen the greater Buddhist community in New Zealand. e. Engage with government and other statutory bodies when their policies and practices affect Buddhist communities. f. Represent Buddhist perspectives in public forums where appropriate. g. Work with other faith communities to nurture mutual understanding and promote peace. h. Engage in any other activities consistent with the above objects

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Education / training / research, Religious activities

Other charities

Voluntary bodies other than charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The New Zealand Buddhist Council is governed by an Executive Committee. Nine representatives on the executive committee are elected by the full members of NZBC. Up to 5 further members may be appointed by the elected representatives. Full members of NZBC must be Buddhist organisations that are registered as charitable organisations within New Zealand. Any other individual or group may be an associate member, but has no voting rights at general meetings of NZBC.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 2/09/2018 $1,399 $23
30/09/2017 1/09/2017 $1,095 $2,591
30/09/2016 10/09/2016 $2,236 $1,245
30/09/2015 22/08/2015 $1,835 $294
30/09/2014 7/09/2014 $1,555 $2,746
30/09/2013 8/09/2013 $4,530 $1,734
30/09/2012 6/02/2013 $2,170 $676
30/09/2011 31/07/2011 $1,319 $547

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rukman Wagachchi Vice Chair 13/08/2016
Simon Clear Harrison Treasurer 2/03/2009
Charlotte Emma Wrightson Chairperson 8/11/2008
Sally Ann Mcara Secretary 8/11/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Glenice Marie Hursthouse Vice Chair 13/08/2016
Joan Buchanan Regions Officer 14/08/2010
Rukman Wagachchi Vice Chairperson 14/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/08/2015 NOC003
18/10/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents