pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Better Blokes Incorporated
CC43643
9429043063796
Registered

Registration details

17/02/2010
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
MSSAT Auckland Incorporated 18/02/2010
Better Blokes Incorporated 12/07/2016

Address for service

PO Box 104289
Lincoln North
Henderson
Auckland
0654
56 Surrey Crescent
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

0274827341
09 378 8820
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/betterblokesnz
Twitter icon image
www.twitter.com/BetterBlokesNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The founding purpose of the organisation is stated in the Constitution “3. Aims and Objectives B. To provide one on one support to men recovering from the effects of childhood trauma: Emotional, mental, verbal, physical and sexual abuse. C. To provide peer support groups for male survivors to continue developing safety and trust through sharing experiences hurts and fears; hopes and dreams (sell-help groups based on self-disclosure models. D. To act as a referral agent to appropriate: Counsellors; therapists and agencies as required for the benefit of clients. .” These objectives are: 1. Reach out, include and support more men who have suffered childhood sexual trauma. 2. Reduce the discrimination and stigma associated with men suffering childhood sexual trauma. 3. Educate men and boys on the importance of healthy safe relationships. 4. Work with others to inform and influence research and opinion within th

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, One on one support and support groups and workshops for men

Social services

Education / training / research, Health

Other (please state)

(Male survivors of childhood sexual abuse), Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 18/10/2020 $280,407 $280,959
30/09/2019 19/09/2019 $245,424 $245,950
30/09/2018 1/10/2018 $173,287 $176,655
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $146,735 $154,520
30/09/2016 9/11/2016 $198,166 $141,673
30/09/2015 22/09/2015 $124,460 $109,468
30/09/2014 15/08/2014 $87,663 $102,497
30/09/2013 26/08/2013 $102,755 $73,848
30/09/2012 9/09/2012 $98,936 $63,428

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Colin Linden Cross Board Member 16/10/2018
David Puddephatt Vice President 14/10/2016
Kris Goodenough Chairman 1/04/2014
David James Peter Passell Manager 24/12/2009
Jorgen Tonneson Knudsen Secretary/Vice president 24/12/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Julian Bryan Spondre Acting Treasurer 1/04/2018
Robert Barrett Treasurer 14/10/2016
Paul Richard Currie Chairman/President 31/03/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/06/2020 NOC010
2/10/2018 NOC008
23/08/2018 NOC006
16/08/2016 NOC003
12/07/2016 NOC002
18/09/2011 AR002

Charity Documents