pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


East Coast Bays Bridge Club Incorporated
CC42889
9429042717911
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 65131
Mairangi Bay
Auckland
754
Lyons Avenue
Murrays Bay
Auckland

Charity's other details

09 479 4689


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing competitive and social bridge play

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Providing competitive and social bridge play/sessions)

Sport / recreation

Other (please state)

(People seeking social and mental activity through playing duplicate bridge)

Entity Structure

A Bridge Club

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 29/09/2020 $72,153 $74,110
31/12/2019 19/08/2019 $100,408 $95,286
31/12/2018 28/08/2018 $99,997 $95,476
31/12/2017 26/09/2017 $100,733 $84,538
31/12/2016 23/09/2016 $91,753 $79,739
31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $84,230 $79,771
31/12/2014 20/11/2014 $76,083 $75,227
31/12/2013 10/12/2013 $81,638 $81,509
31/12/2012 10/12/2012 $77,283 $48,048
31/12/2011 18/10/2011 $78,500 $81,500

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Susanne Juanita Brighouse Secretary 27/09/2020
Richard Martyn Buisson President 18/08/2019
Alec James Isaacs Treasurer 23/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katherine Anne Stuart Secretary 27/09/2020
Geoffrey Edward Sullivan President 18/08/2019
Judith Anne Shinegold Secretary 18/08/2019
Meriel Jane Treeves Secretary 19/08/2018
Pamela O'Carroll President 21/08/2016
Ann Donalson Secreatary 23/08/2015
Raymond Orr Vice President 21/08/2015
Frank Roach Vice-Chairman 24/08/2014
Helene Labreche President 24/08/2014
James Richard Hill President 24/08/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/03/2019 NOC019
25/08/2018 NOC017
24/08/2018 NOC016
11/02/2016 NOC013
15/01/2016 NOC012
21/12/2015 NOC011
20/11/2014 NOC010
10/12/2013 NOC008
26/10/2012 NOC004
7/10/2012 NOC003

Charity Documents