pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Eye Health Aotearoa
CC41236
9429043183951
Registered

Registration details

5/07/2009
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Vision 2020 New Zealand 6/07/2009
Eye Health Aotearoa 20/02/2020

Address for service

PO Box 9740
Newmarket
Epsom
Auckland
1149

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Trust are to: 1) Eliminate avoidable vision impairment and blindness in New Zealand (NZ) 2) Develop a Population Eye Health capability in NZ 3) Enable collaboration between all parties with interests in the elimination of avoidable blindness in NZ 4) Promote the delivery of eye health services I order to achieve the first object 5) Facilitate the development of Eye Health Policy in NZ 6) Do all things that are incidental or conducive to the attainment of the objects detailed above.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Older people, General public

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by the appointed volunteer trustees who represent different parts of the eye health sector.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 19/08/2021 $5,060 $5,071
30/09/2020 11/06/2020 $19 $3,145
30/09/2019 4/07/2019 $48 $59
30/09/2018 28/07/2018 $59 $60
30/09/2017 5/07/2017 $118 $13
30/09/2016 24/07/2016 $361 $1,515
30/09/2015 22/06/2015 $861 $576
30/09/2014 28/04/2014 $5,575 $856
30/09/2013 25/08/2013 $5,486 $1,792
30/09/2012 18/07/2012 $5,294 $4,971

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sam Kain Trustee 16/12/2020
Anna-Louise Mavis Crane Trustee 27/11/2020
Christina Cowan Trustee 6/08/2020
Lynley Jane Hood Trustee 6/08/2020
John Mulka Interim Chairperson 22/10/2019
Brian Tracey Kent-Smith Trustee 15/10/2018
Chelsey Alix Alexander Trustee 15/10/2018
Steven Charles Dakin Trustee 15/10/2018
Suzanne Jane Emirali Deputy-Chairperson 15/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Helen Danesh-Meyer Trustee 16/12/2020
Phillippa Foster Pitcher Trustee 26/11/2020
Ana Lee Chair 17/04/2020
Sandra Dennice Budd Trustee 19/11/2019
Darren Francis Ward Independent Chair 15/11/2019
Trevor Goodwin Trustee 15/11/2019
Derek Sherwood Trustee 15/10/2018
Ronald Fraser Fyfe Trustee 15/10/2018
Andrew Jeffrey Sangster Trustee 22/05/2015
Richard Edwards Trustee 22/05/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/08/2021 NOC029
16/12/2020 NOC028
30/11/2020 NOC027
5/10/2020 NOC026
10/06/2020 NOC024
17/04/2020 NOC023
17/04/2020 NOC022
20/02/2020 NOC021
11/02/2020 NOC020
20/12/2019 NOC019

Charity Documents